U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30092-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Cook et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 02, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 05, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 03, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 03, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 03, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 21, 2018: [Furlough]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 26, 2018: [Furlough]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 21, 2018: [Furlough]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 12, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 09, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 09, 2018: [Furlough]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order]
  • December 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 19, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 19, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 27, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • June 22, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 08, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 07, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 30, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 24, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 07, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 11, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 03, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • September 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 01, 2016: [Request]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Request]
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 27, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 27, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 26, 2016: [Request]
  • July 26, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.