U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. High Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transcript OR Ex Parte Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • September 18, 2019: [Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 13, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 05, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • May 22, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
  • May 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 19, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 20, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 13, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 10, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 24, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 13, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 04, 2016: [Request]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 03, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 03, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 03, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 03, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 03, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 03, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 03, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 02, 2016: [Arrest]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.