U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cottier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 29, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 26, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 22, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 13, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 12, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 12, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 23, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 23, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 22, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 14, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • April 06, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 06, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • March 31, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 31, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • March 24, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 23, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • March 22, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 02, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 02, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 02, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 18, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 18, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 18, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Arrest]
  • September 09, 2016: [Request]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 09, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 09, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.