U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Long Black Cat
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 29, 2016: [Court Trial Held (One Day Trial)]
  • November 29, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 16, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 10, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 09, 2016: [In Limine]
  • November 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 04, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 28, 2016: [In Limine]
  • October 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2016: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.