U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Mail Returned]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Declaration]
  • July 06, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Certificate]
  • June 17, 2020: [Response]
  • June 12, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 08, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 16, 2020: [Forfeiture]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 05, 2017: [Evaluation]
  • May 01, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 01, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 01, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 17, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 13, 2017: [Forfeiture]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Request]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 05, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2016: [Arrest]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.