U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 01, 2019: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • April 01, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 09, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 02, 2019: [Extend]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 12, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 12, 2018: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order]
  • October 10, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 03, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • October 02, 2018: [Competency Report]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Response]
  • August 08, 2018: [Objection]
  • August 07, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • August 03, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 07, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 29, 2016: [Request]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2016: [Arrest]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.