U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ventura
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 15, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Allocution Statement]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 22, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Response]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Request]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2016: [Interpreter No Longer Needed]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 27, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 27, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • July 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 27, 2016: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.