U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04112
  • Case Name: Superior Agronomy Solutions, LLC v. ANTHEALTH, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 20, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 08, 2016: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • November 08, 2016: [Crossclaim]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 31, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 31, 2016: [Default Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Certificate]
  • September 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 14, 2016: [Crossclaim]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • August 25, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 04, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 04, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 04, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 04, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.