U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tiner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 09, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.