U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phiavong
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 15, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 26, 2016: [Discovery]
  • August 22, 2016: [Response]
  • August 18, 2016: [Request]
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 15, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.