U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:03-cr-50094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 22, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2020: [Consent]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 11, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 26, 2019: [Waiver]
  • August 23, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 20, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 20, 2019: [Request for Warrant]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 11, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2019: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • June 17, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • May 31, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Johnson Claim - Motion to Reduce Sentence (filed in Civil Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.