U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haron et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 02, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Response]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 13, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 09, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 30, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 19, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 19, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • April 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 13, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 10, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 08, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 16, 2017: [Furlough]
  • January 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 06, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 02, 2016: [Release from Custody]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 26, 2016: [Discovery]
  • August 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 15, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.