U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaRoche
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 14, 2022: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 08, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 08, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • June 08, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 08, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 08, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • June 08, 2017: [Verdict]
  • June 08, 2017: [Response to Jury Question]
  • June 08, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • June 08, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 07, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 06, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 06, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 06, 2017: [Jury List]
  • June 05, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 05, 2017: [In Limine]
  • June 02, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 02, 2017: [Witness List]
  • June 02, 2017: [Exhibit List]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 30, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 30, 2017: [Response]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice]
  • May 30, 2017: [Witness List]
  • May 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 25, 2017: [In Limine]
  • May 25, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 23, 2017: [In Limine]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 30, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Response]
  • March 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Suppress]
  • March 10, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 07, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2016: [Furlough]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Request]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2016: [Arrest]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 16, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2016: [Request]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.