U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grey et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 02, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 10, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • May 21, 2018: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • May 21, 2018: [Statement of Facts in Support of Pretrial Diversion]
  • May 21, 2018: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 07, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 23, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 05, 2018: [Request]
  • February 05, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 05, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 02, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 02, 2018: [Request]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • July 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 13, 2016: [Arrest]
  • October 12, 2016: [Request]
  • October 12, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Request]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.