U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walking Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 05, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 05, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 02, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • December 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 29, 2016: [Extend]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 07, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 23, 2016: [Arrest]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2016: [Request]
  • August 22, 2016: [Request]
  • August 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.