U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Byington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 18, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 18, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • July 10, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 10, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 07, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 07, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • May 11, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 10, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 10, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • May 10, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 26, 2017: [Furlough]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 22, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 02, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 02, 2017: [Request]
  • February 02, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2017: [Bail Report]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.