U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2020: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 31, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 11, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 11, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 31, 2017: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 23, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2016: [Request]
  • October 13, 2016: [Request]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2016: [Arrest]
  • October 12, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.