U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Transcript]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 01, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 01, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • May 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • May 15, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 07, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 07, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 31, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 27, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 20, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2016: [Response]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 22, 2016: [Request]
  • September 21, 2016: [Request]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 15, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2016: [Request]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 08, 2016: [Request]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2016: [Arrest]
  • September 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.