U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCloskey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 29, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 25, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 06, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 19, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • February 06, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 06, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 05, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 04, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 08, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 06, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 23, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 23, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 22, 2017: [Extend]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Request]
  • September 13, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 12, 2016: [Arrest]
  • September 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 12, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2016: [Request]
  • September 12, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.