U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Snyman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 02, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 02, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 02, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Information - Felony]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • October 17, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 16, 2018: [Seal Existing Document]
  • October 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 10, 2018: [Extend]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 20, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 08, 2018: [Transcript]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 03, 2018: [Extend]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 28, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 28, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 27, 2018: [New Trial]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 09, 2018: [Transcript]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 10, 2018: [Transcript]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 21, 2017: [Acquittal]
  • December 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order]
  • December 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2017: [Response]
  • December 08, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • December 08, 2017: [Verdict]
  • December 08, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • December 08, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 08, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • December 08, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 06, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • December 06, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 06, 2017: [Jury List]
  • December 05, 2017: [Reply]
  • December 05, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 05, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 04, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 01, 2017: [In Limine]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [Supplement]
  • November 29, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2017: [Response]
  • November 27, 2017: [Supplement]
  • November 27, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 22, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2017: [Response]
  • November 20, 2017: [Response]
  • November 20, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 17, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 17, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 16, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 15, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 15, 2017: [Supplement]
  • November 15, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • November 03, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 08, 2017: [Compel ]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 02, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.