U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 06, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 28, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 13, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 08, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 23, 2017: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 18, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 16, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 06, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 06, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Request]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 17, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 17, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.