U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schottenstein
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 13, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 02, 2018: [Extend]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • January 24, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 02, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.