U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bordeaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 15, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 15, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 03, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 25, 2016: [Request]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 24, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2016: [Arrest]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 23, 2016: [Request]
  • August 23, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2016: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.