U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 03, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 22, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 19, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 16, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 12, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 12, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 07, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 15, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 14, 2017: [Request]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 13, 2017: [Request]
  • February 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 13, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 13, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 13, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.