U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Spotted Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 07, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 17, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Transcript]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 26, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 17, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • December 12, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Request for Summons]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 07, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • August 01, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 10, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 03, 2016: [For Order]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 22, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2016: [Request]
  • August 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Arrest]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 23, 2016: [Request]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.