U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue Thunder et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • May 21, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 14, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Case Reopened]
  • January 03, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 03, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 16, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 27, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 27, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • September 25, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 25, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 28, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 28, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 27, 2017: [Witness List]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 14, 2017: [Extend]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • November 13, 2017: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • November 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 13, 2017: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
  • November 07, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 01, 2017: [Extend]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 24, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 24, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 23, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • September 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 12, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 29, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Jury List]
  • August 14, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 03, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 17, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 17, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • July 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 13, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2017: [Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 08, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 23, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 09, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 23, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 23, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 21, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 21, 2016: [Request]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 02, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • August 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 24, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 24, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2016: [Request]
  • August 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 24, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2016: [Request]
  • August 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 23, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.