U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCloskey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 04, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 29, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • August 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2016: [Request]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 24, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2016: [Request]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.