U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goggleye
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 26, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • June 01, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 03, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Request]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 20, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.