U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Drussell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 19, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • January 18, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • January 18, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • January 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 17, 2018: [Evaluation]
  • January 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 07, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 04, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 09, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2016: [Response]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Transcript]
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 27, 2016: [Transcript]
  • October 19, 2016: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • October 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 11, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 23, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2016: [Text Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 21, 2016: [Indictment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.