U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-01043
  • Case Name: Biel v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2019: [Proposed Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 25, 2019: [Settlement Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 29, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • April 06, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 22, 2018: [Stay]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 08, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Discovery Report]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • November 28, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Service]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 21, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 21, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 21, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 21, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.