U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04142
  • Case Name: Traversie v. Starr et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • January 03, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 03, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • February 20, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 13, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 12, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 12, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 07, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2017: [Compel]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 12, 2017: [Received]
  • June 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • June 12, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 05, 2017: [Compel]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 06, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • February 17, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • February 16, 2017: [Leave to]
  • February 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2017: [Summons Reissued]
  • February 06, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • February 06, 2017: [Service by Publication]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • January 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 24, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2017: [Summons Issued]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 10, 2016: [Extend]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 13, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 28, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • September 28, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • September 28, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 28, 2016: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.