U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Shell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 23, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 23, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 21, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • September 21, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 03, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 17, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 15, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 30, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.