U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05090
  • Case Name: Witcraft v. City of Spearfish et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2019: [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Designation of Expert Witness]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 07, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Discovery Report]
November, 2016
  • November 06, 2016: [Order for Discovery Report]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 18, 2016: [Return of Service Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 30, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 30, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 30, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.