U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reta-Castillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 26, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 10, 2017: [Discovery]
  • March 06, 2017: [Response]
  • March 01, 2017: [Request]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 27, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 27, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • February 24, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.