U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Potter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • June 27, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2022: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 03, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 23, 2020: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • March 18, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 26, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order of Detention]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 21, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 17, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 14, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 07, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 01, 2018: [Sentencing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • January 23, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Transport Defendant]
  • January 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 30, 2017: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 19, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 19, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 19, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 15, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 03, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Request]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 30, 2017: [Request]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 30, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 04, 2017: [Arrest]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.