U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cable
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 08, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 03, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Consent]
  • February 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 10, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2021: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Request for Warrant]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 05, 2020: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • October 02, 2020: [Consent]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 24, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 26, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 13, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 28, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 28, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 28, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 24, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • January 24, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 19, 2018: [Discovery]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2018: [Request]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 24, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 23, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 25, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.