U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holloway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 30, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 23, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • October 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 22, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 03, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • August 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice]
  • July 13, 2017: [Response]
  • July 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2017: [Request]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2017: [Arrest]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.