U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • January 10, 2018: [Transport Defendant]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2017: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2017: [Request]
  • January 10, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 21, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • November 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.