U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sozzi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 05, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 07, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 07, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • August 07, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 07, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • August 07, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 01, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 31, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 31, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Discovery]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 21, 2016: [Discovery]
  • October 20, 2016: [Response]
  • October 19, 2016: [Request]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 18, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.