U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 21, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 05, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.