U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dyson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 17, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 12, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2017: [Evaluation]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • September 14, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2016: [Request]
  • October 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 12, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 05, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.