U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Donahue
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 11, 2017: [Certificate]
  • October 06, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • August 10, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 10, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 09, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 09, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Waiver]
  • June 09, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • June 09, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 23, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 23, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Status Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Competency Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 20, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Compel ]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 21, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • October 14, 2016: [Competency Evaluation]
  • October 06, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 06, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 05, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 04, 2016: [Indictment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Request]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.