U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-30120-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Eagle Chasing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 15, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 12, 2019: [Transcript]
  • July 08, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 02, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 02, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 01, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • March 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 28, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 27, 2019: [Suppress]
  • March 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 25, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 12, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 12, 2019: [Recusal]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Transcript]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • December 19, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 07, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 07, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 06, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 03, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • January 26, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 26, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 20, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 19, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 19, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 06, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 06, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 28, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 28, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 28, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 28, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 28, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 06, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.