U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Youngman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 14, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 14, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 10, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 31, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 27, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 25, 2016: [Request]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 12, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 12, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.