U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zafft
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 16, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 14, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Reduce Sentence]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 23, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 13, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 18, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • October 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.