U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jervik
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 25, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • September 25, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 25, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 14, 2017: [Passport - Return of]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • July 25, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
  • July 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2017: [Evaluation]
  • July 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 17, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • April 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 11, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Request]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2016: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • October 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Arrest]
  • October 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.