U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 05, 2018: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 26, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 16, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • June 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Furlough]
  • May 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 26, 2017: [Furlough]
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 04, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 04, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 17, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Request]
  • November 10, 2016: [Request]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Arrest]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.