U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Two Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 16, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 18, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 09, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • May 03, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • April 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 06, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 25, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 25, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Response]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 14, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 06, 2017: [Transcript]
  • November 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 31, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 26, 2017: [Response]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [Suppress]
  • October 17, 2017: [Extend]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 21, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 20, 2016: [Request]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • October 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Request]
  • October 19, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.