U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thin Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 10, 2023: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • December 19, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • December 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 02, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 10, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 04, 2020: [Transcript]
  • November 02, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 02, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 02, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 02, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 14, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 14, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • September 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 09, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 08, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 19, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 12, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 12, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 08, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 08, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 08, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 08, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 02, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • February 07, 2017: [Response]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Change Venue]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 20, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 19, 2016: [Request]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Request]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 15, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.