U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-50091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. High Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Consent]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 25, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 11, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 11, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 21, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 20, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 14, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 14, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 13, 2016: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • October 12, 2016: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 12, 2016: [Request for Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.